DONCASTER METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We advance the Christian Faith in accordance with the doctrinal standards and discipline of the Methodist Church by - facilitating the provision of sacred space (buildings) for prayer and contemplation - facilitating or promoting Christianity through the staging of events and services - supporting or facilitating other charities in the UK and overseas financially and with prayer
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

54 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Doncaster
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 11 February 2010: Standard registration
- 04 May 2022: Funds received from 1129555 PRIORY PLACE METHODIST CHURCH
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
54 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev John Paul HENRY | Chair | 01 September 2023 |
|
|||||
David William DENNIS | Trustee | 16 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Phillip RANDALL | Trustee | 16 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robert James BRITTAIN | Trustee | 16 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jean DENNIS | Trustee | 16 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Eunice RANDALL | Trustee | 16 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carol CORGRIDGE BA PGCE | Trustee | 16 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Hodgson | Trustee | 05 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
JAYNE ANN ALDER | Trustee | 05 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
MARY VERONICA SCOTT | Trustee | 05 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Stuart Alan WILLERTON | Trustee | 04 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Geoffrey Lloyd RAPER | Trustee | 04 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
David John BEARDSALL | Trustee | 04 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Louise GALLACHER | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Harry Robinson | Trustee | 29 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Robert Hunt WINN | Trustee | 29 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christine Mary OGLEY | Trustee | 22 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
ALISON HUDSON | Trustee | 22 August 2023 |
|
|||||
Peter Harris | Trustee | 22 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sylvia Joan Fletcher | Trustee | 22 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ian Richard Ogley | Trustee | 22 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anne Worrall | Trustee | 22 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Woodcock Hempstock | Trustee | 09 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Brian Hempstock | Trustee | 09 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Preethi Soshna ALURI MBA | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sean WORSLEY BA Hons | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
JOHN ALAN MENDUM | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|||||
Christine Raper | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Amy Ruth RODDAM | Trustee | 09 January 2017 |
|
|||||
TOM SYKES | Trustee | 29 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
Dr DAVID ROBERT HEPWORTH BA, PHD | Trustee | 27 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
BRENDA MARY PLUMMER SRN | Trustee | 27 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
ANN WREN | Trustee | 27 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
DAVID ARTHUR HARRISON | Trustee | 27 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
JANET ANN PARKER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS VERA SUTCLIFFE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOAN MARY THACKRAY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS J BOLTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GLENISE MARY SINNOTT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARGARET E CROMPTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HAZEL PATRICIA HEPWORTH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BARRY EDWARD PARKER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Kathryn Harris | Trustee |
|
||||||
JOHN WILLIAM HOLFORD | Trustee |
|
||||||
JULIE PARKER | Trustee |
|
||||||
MARGARET ANN WILSON | Trustee |
|
||||||
TREVOR TAYLOR | Trustee |
|
||||||
REV TOM READ | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS WILMA GIBSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BERENICE ANNE ELLIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JUDITH ADELE TAYLOR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROBERT LESLIE SCULTHORPE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS M WALKER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
VERA HOLFORD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £656.73k | £259.04k | £325.68k | £662.63k | £448.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £374.20k | £400.69k | £438.47k | £493.50k | £422.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £14.60k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £104.00k | N/A | N/A | £140 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £317.00k | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £31.00k | N/A | N/A | £48.89k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £204.00k | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £374.14k | N/A | N/A | £492.87k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £58 | N/A | N/A | £622 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | N/A | N/A | £471.76k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | £21.11k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | £622 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 27 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 27 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 19 August 2024 | 50 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 19 August 2024 | 50 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 August 2023 | 61 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 30 August 2023 | 61 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 27 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 27 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE METHODIST CHURCH ARE AND SHALL BE DEEMED TO HAVE BEEN SINCE THE DATE OF UNION THE ADVANCEMENT OF - (A) THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL STANDARDS AND THE DISCIPLINE OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (B) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CONNEXIONAL, DISTRICT, CIRCUIT, LOCAL OR OTHER ORGANISATION OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (C) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY SOCIETY OR INSTITUTION SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH; (D) ANY PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CHARITY BEING A CHARITY SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Alder Grove METHODIST CHURCH
Alder Grove
DONCASTER
DN4 8RF
- Phone:
- 01302 850370
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window