CARDIFF METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Circuit acts as an umbrella and a resource.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income:
£547,442
Donations and legacies | £153.97k | |
Charitable activities | £312.70k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £80.17k | |
Other | £600 |
Total expenditure:
£639,913
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £639.91k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £639.91k |
People

10 Employee(s)
60 Trustee(s)
75 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Caerphilly
- Cardiff
Governance
- 10 February 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
60 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev CATHY GALE | Chair | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Judith Powell | Trustee | 01 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Angela Bailey | Trustee | 01 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Stephen Wigley | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Dr Chai Tin Tang | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Laura Evans | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Evelyn Bhajan | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Vera Ruddock | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Witts | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peggy Lau | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Carol Pym | Trustee | 13 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
MONICA SYMONDS | Trustee | 13 May 2021 |
|
|||||
Christine Stanley | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|||||
Gillian Griffiths | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Armah Ofoe | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ann Thomas | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Matthew Angilley | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Steve McElveen | Trustee | 18 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Bethany Jane Barry | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sylvia Catherine Hewett | Trustee | 01 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Judith Holliman | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Christopher Markall | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Dodd | Trustee | 19 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Barwise | Trustee | 19 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Alexis Mahoney | Trustee | 19 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sidney Chandler | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Helen Tyler | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Gauri Taylor-Nayar | Trustee | 01 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
ANN CROSS | Trustee | 01 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Medina | Trustee | 01 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Cross | Trustee | 01 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Terry Wing | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
HEATHER COX | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Liz Crispie | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Karen Smith | Trustee | 25 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
Janice Perris | Trustee | 25 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
Paul Demery | Trustee | 25 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
Janet Rees | Trustee | 25 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
Allison Patricia Hill | Trustee | 25 February 2014 |
|
|||||
Diane Lesley Richards | Trustee | 25 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
John Powell | Trustee | 25 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
Peter Smith | Trustee | 25 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
Mrs Marie Edwards | Trustee | 25 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Cane | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|||||
JOHN VIVIAN ELIAS | Trustee | 21 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN MORRIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN PLUMRIDGE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DEREK PERKINS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAUL RAYMOND KNIGHT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETER DAVID GEORGE RICHARDS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRISTINA MARGARET CROW | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr MAURICE ARTHUR WENTWORTH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DR CATH TAYLOR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANTHONY PAUL THOMAS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CAROL ELIZABETH PLUMRIDGE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Rev IRFAN JOHN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GRAHAM HOSGOOD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS ANN THOMAS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARTIN RONALD HUNT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
IRENE WELSBY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £479.67k | £520.20k | £510.01k | £450.56k | £547.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £478.14k | £506.54k | £531.33k | £367.14k | £639.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £520.20k | £43.07k | N/A | £153.97k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £0 | £389.86k | N/A | £312.70k | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £0 | £73.79k | N/A | £80.17k | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | £3.29k | N/A | £600 | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £372.73k | £531.33k | N/A | £639.91k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £123.17k | £0 | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £0 | £2.80k | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £10.65k | £0 | N/A | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | £0 | £5.19m | N/A | £2.41m | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | £2.82m | |
|
Other assets | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | £633.77k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | £345.68k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 21 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 21 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 21 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 21 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 22 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 22 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 02 July 2020 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 02 July 2020 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE METHODIST CHURCH ARE AND SHALL BE DEEMED TO HAVE BEEN SINCE THE DATE OF UNION THE ADVANCEMENT OF - (A) THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL STANDARDS AND THE DISCIPLINE OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (B) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CONNEXIONAL, DISTRICT, CIRCUIT, LOCAL OR OTHER ORGANISATION OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (C) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY SOCIETY OR INSTITUTION SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH; (D) ANY PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CHARITY BEING A CHARITY SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CYNCOED METHODIST CHURCH
WESTMINSTER CRESCENT
CARDIFF
CF23 6SE
- Phone:
- 02920393436
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window