OXFORD DIOCESAN BOARD OF EDUCATION

Charity number: 1133586
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Charity is responsible for promoting and assisting education in the Diocese consistent with the faith and practice of the Church of England;religious education and worship in schools; and the open admissions policy of the Diocese of Oxford. It also exists to advise governors and promote co-operation between those concerned with education in the Diocese.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Bracknell Forest
  • Buckinghamshire
  • Milton Keynes
  • Oxfordshire
  • Reading
  • Slough
  • West Berkshire
  • Windsor And Maidenhead
  • Wokingham

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 January 2010: Standard registration
  • 09 December 2011: Funds received from 307913 OXFORD DIOCESAN BOARD OF EDUCATION
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

21 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev JASON PAUL ST JOHN NICOLLE Trustee 01 January 2025
THE SOUTH MORETON CONSOLIDATED CHARITY
Received: On time
Rev Samuel Christopher Ferris Trustee 01 January 2025
KEDERMINSTER LIBRARY
Received: On time
Michael George Mill Trustee 01 January 2025
LOVE WYCOMBE
Received: On time
Sharron Tulle Marland Trustee 01 January 2025
None on record
Alison Jane McBride Trustee 01 January 2025
None on record
Vivienne Angela Lister Trustee 01 January 2025
None on record
Rebecca Jane Morris Trustee 01 October 2024
None on record
The Rt Revd Gavin Andrew Collins Trustee 19 March 2024
THE OXFORD DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
DIOCESAN TRUSTEES (OXFORD) LTD
PETER FLORY Trustee 01 January 2022
NOVI MOST INTERNATIONAL
Received: On time
THE CORNELIUS TRUST
Received: On time
CHILTERN CHRISTIAN TRUST
Received: On time
THE OXFORD DIOCESAN COUNCIL FOR THE DEAF AND HARD OF HEARING
Received: On time
Chris Tomes Trustee 01 January 2022
None on record
Hannah Joyce Brown Trustee 01 January 2022
None on record
Matthew Geoffrey Abbott Trustee 01 March 2020
None on record
TREFOR WILMOT LLEWELLYN Trustee 01 January 2019
None on record
Lorna Mary Piper Trustee 01 January 2019
None on record
Dr Felix Charles Penrice Leach Trustee 01 January 2019
KEBLE COLLEGE IN THE UNIVERSITY OF OXFORD
Received: On time
PATRICIA ANN HUDSON Trustee 24 November 2017
None on record
THE RIGHT REVD DR STEVEN JOHN LINDSEY CROFT Trustee 06 July 2016
THE OXFORD DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
THE BISHOP OF OXFORD'S DISCRETIONARY FUND
Received: On time
BAYNE BENEFACTION
Received: On time
DIOCESAN TRUSTEES (OXFORD) LTD
OXFORD CLERGY CHARITY
Received: On time
PETER ROSS NORMAN Trustee 27 March 2013
None on record
KATHY WINROW Trustee 01 January 2013
None on record
Rev MARK DAVID BENNET Trustee 01 January 2013
THATCHAM PARK CHURCH OF ENGLAND PRIMARY SCHOOL TRUST
Charity reporting is overdue by 312 days
BIAPT (BRITISH AND IRISH ASSOCIATION FOR PRACTICAL THEOLOGY)
Received: 39 days late
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OFTHE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY, THATCHAM
Charity reporting is overdue by 189 days
MOOR MEADOW CHARITY
Received: On time
WESTCOTT HOUSE
Received: On time
CULHAM ST GABRIEL'S TRUST
Received: On time
LADY FRANCES WINCHCOMBE'S THATCHAM FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THATCHAM RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
THATCHAM PAROCHIAL ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
Rev TIMOTHY JAMES LINCOLN HARPER Trustee 01 January 2010
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £1.66m £5.43m £5.01m £6.02m £5.03m
Total expenditure £1.71m £4.05m £5.07m £4.99m £6.33m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £4.28m £3.15m
Income - Donations and legacies £823.00k £4.66m £4.14m £5.06m £3.97m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £822.00k £750.00k £854.00k £892.00k £886.00k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £15.00k £16.00k £13.00k £65.00k £126.00k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £3.00k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.71m £4.05m £5.07m £4.99m £6.33m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £23.00k £16.00k £22.00k £21.00k £25.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets £8.00k £7.00k £4.00k £5.00k £5.00k
Long-term investments £398.00k £426.00k £487.00k £430.00k £471.00k
Other assets £1.59m £2.86m £2.95m £3.76m £4.10m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £773.00k £667.00k £807.00k £586.00k £2.27m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 15 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 15 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 13 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 13 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 04 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 04 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 26 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 26 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 16 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 16 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
CHURCH HOUSE OXFORD
LANGFORD LOCKS
KIDLINGTON
OXFORD
OX5 1GF
Phone:
01865208200