SOUTHPORT METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity Number: 1134383
Charity reporting is up to date (68 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We are the UK Methodist Church in Southport (including Scarisbrick). It supports the Presbyters and staff with administration. Where directed by its Managing Trustees, through the Circuit Meeting, it supports other charities with small donations.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £262,714
Total expenditure: £385,219

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Lancashire
  • Sefton

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 February 2010: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

37 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Susan Patricia Yelland Trustee 01 February 2025
None on record
Gillian Mary Moor Trustee 01 September 2024
ST PHILIP AND ST PAUL WITH WESLEY, SOUTHPORT
Received: On time
Jennifer Wallbanks Trustee 01 September 2024
None on record
Brian James Davey Trustee 01 September 2023
None on record
Rev Sheila Elizabeth Prest Trustee 01 September 2023
None on record
Rev Derek Westerdale Bowker Trustee 01 September 2023
None on record
Brenda Domville Trustee 01 September 2023
None on record
Rev Ernest Grimshaw Trustee 01 September 2023
LEYLAND ROAD METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Peter James Musker Trustee 01 September 2023
None on record
Janet Anne Bowker Trustee 01 September 2023
None on record
Elizabeth Mugill Morris Trustee 01 September 2023
None on record
William Mark Pickering Trustee 01 September 2023
None on record
JANET TAYLOR-HOLMES Trustee 01 September 2023
None on record
PETER ALAN TAYLOR-HOLMES Trustee 01 September 2023
None on record
Irene Nora Watts Trustee 01 September 2023
None on record
MARGARET CROSBY Trustee 01 September 2023
LEYLAND ROAD METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Christopher George Hall Trustee 01 September 2023
LEYLAND ROAD METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Ray Flanagan Trustee 12 September 2022
None on record
Patrica Ann Wright Trustee 01 September 2019
None on record
Barry James Stewart Trustee 01 September 2019
LIVERPOOL ROAD METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
ST PHILIP AND ST PAUL WITH WESLEY, SOUTHPORT
Received: On time
Margaret Harwood Trustee 01 September 2017
None on record
Rachel Bray Trustee 01 September 2017
None on record
Peter Jones Trustee 01 September 2017
None on record
Sally Deborah Eyes BSc Trustee 01 September 2015
None on record
David Hugh Campbell Trustee 01 September 2015
None on record
Andrew Malcolm Tate Trustee 01 September 2015
LIVERPOOL ROAD METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
THE GUIDE ASSOCIATION-COUNTY OF SEFTON
Received: On time
LEYLAND ROAD METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
RUTH CAROL LANE SRC Trustee 01 September 2015
LORD STREET WEST UNITED CHURCH
Received: On time
REV PATRICK MICHAEL EVANS Trustee 01 September 2013
LEYLAND ROAD METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
AINSDALE LUNCH AND LEISURE
Received: On time
LIVERPOOL ROAD METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
DR DOMINIC GERALD BRAY CLIN.PSY.D Trustee 01 September 2013
None on record
PAMELA MAY O'MALLEY Trustee 01 September 2013
None on record
Rev Marie-Anne Kent Trustee 01 September 2012
LIVERPOOL DISTRICT METHODIST CHURCH
Charity reporting is overdue by 329 days
Stephen Hardiman Trustee 01 September 2009
LEYLAND ROAD METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
SHIRLEY ANNE POTTS Trustee 01 September 2009
SOUTHPORT AND AREA SCHOOLS WORKER TRUST
Received: On time
LEYLAND ROAD METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
IAN WRIGHT Trustee 01 September 2009
LORD STREET WEST UNITED CHURCH
Received: On time
Rev ALEXANDER PETER JAMES GALBRAITH Trustee 01 September 2009
None on record
LESLEY GODDARD Trustee 01 August 2009
None on record
JOHN SCHOFIELD ATTWATER Trustee
LEYLAND ROAD METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £284.23k £261.83k £388.35k £305.41k £262.71k
Total expenditure £285.99k £281.77k £289.89k £296.51k £385.22k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £8.67k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 06 September 2024 68 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 06 September 2024 68 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 04 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 05 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 11 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 11 April 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 05 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 05 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 22 September 2020 84 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 22 September 2020 84 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Methodist Church
Leyland Road
SOUTHPORT
Merseyside
PR9 9JQ
Phone:
01704 264775