THE FRIENDS OF ST GEORGE'S JESMOND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Assist in the preservation, maintenance, repairs or improvement for the benefit of the general public of the church and churchyard of St George's Jesmond as an ancient building of beauty and historic interest. Create, raise and administer a fund to be used for the sole purpose of maintaining the fabric of the said church, repairing the fitting thereof and preserving its curtilage.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
Governance
- 02 November 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joan Margaret Trinder | Trustee | 23 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA VALERIE PEACOCK MBE | Trustee | 21 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
PAUL TAYLOR | Trustee | 21 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
HILARY ANN PITKETHLY | Trustee | 21 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Claire Melbourne | Trustee | 08 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Michael de la Hunt | Trustee | 30 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Mercer | Trustee | 17 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dorothy Gregory | Trustee | 26 April 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.89k | £2.71k | £5.73k | £4.97k | £8.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.67k | £1.84k | £1.53k | £521 | £5.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 February 2021 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29 SEPTEMBER 2010
Charitable objects
1) TO PRESERVE OR ASSIST IN THE PRESERVATION, MAINTENANCE, REPAIRS OR IMPROVEMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC OF THE CHURCH AND CHURCHYARD OF ST GEORGE'S JESMOND AS AN ANCIENT BUILDING OF BEAUTY AND HISTORIC INTEREST 2) TO CREATE RAISE AND ADMINISTER A FUND TO BE USED FOR THE SOLE PURPOSE OF REPAIRING THE FABRIC OF THE SAID CHURCH REPAIRING THE FITTING THEREOF AND PRESERVING ITS CURTILAGE OR IMPROVING, REPLACING OR RESTORING ANY PART THEREOF
Area of benefit
ST GEORGE'S, JESMOND
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 NORTH JESMOND AVENUE
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE2 3JX
- Phone:
- 0191 281 4755
- Email:
- bvpeacock21@icloud.com
- Website:
-
friendsofstgeorgesjesmond.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window