COVENTRY AND NUNEATON METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Coventry and Nuneaton Methodist Circuit facilitates and encourages the worship of God in the Warwickshire area. As part of our mission we use our buildings not only for worship on Sunday but also for a number of community activities during the week, sharing the love of God through word and deed.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

47 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Coventry City
- Solihull
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 16 February 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
47 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elaine Lesley Davenport | Trustee | 31 March 2025 |
|
|||||||
Naume Yeukai Chiimba | Trustee | 31 March 2025 |
|
|
||||||
Pam Hopkins | Trustee | 01 December 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Christine Crabtree | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Tim Jefferies | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||||
ALASTAIR THOMAS McCULLOCH | Trustee | 01 June 2024 |
|
|||||||
Rev Jill Marsh | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Joy Elizabeth Marie Fine | Trustee | 01 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Michaela Allsopp | Trustee | 19 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Patricia Swift | Trustee | 16 February 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Judith Mudzamiri | Trustee | 09 September 2021 |
|
|||||||
Kathleen Allton | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||||
PEREPETUA RANGARIRAYI SAKURINGWA | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Lynne McKeown | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Helen Irene Love | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Taedza Sigauke | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Karen Jane Brooks | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Beverley Taylor | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Andrew Stephen Willey | Trustee | 01 February 2020 |
|
|||||||
Gordon Hopkins | Trustee | 13 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Doreen Koffie-Williams | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|||||||
Robert Clive Bennett | Trustee | 01 February 2019 |
|
|
||||||
DUMISANI MOYO | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|||||||
Pamela Alice Reid | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|||||||
Ray Arnold | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Alison Lindsey Lawn | Trustee | 31 August 2016 |
|
|||||||
Mary Georgina Warr | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|||||||
KENNETH LEONARD HOLMES | Trustee | 31 August 2014 |
|
|||||||
Henning Kleine | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
||||||
Mrs Marion Rixson | Trustee | 01 May 2013 |
|
|
||||||
Tony Cashmore | Trustee | 01 May 2013 |
|
|
||||||
Rosemary Ann Clemo | Trustee | 01 May 2013 |
|
|
||||||
Dawn Maycock | Trustee | 01 May 2013 |
|
|
||||||
John Edward Bennett | Trustee | 01 May 2013 |
|
|||||||
Denise Margaret Huxley | Trustee | 01 May 2013 |
|
|
||||||
Deana Mawn | Trustee | 01 May 2013 |
|
|
||||||
Christine Patricia Moore | Trustee | 01 April 2012 |
|
|
||||||
Brian Cartwright | Trustee | 01 November 1993 |
|
|
||||||
RICHARD JOHN SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
MRS VAL GADSBY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
Graham Alexander Hargreaves | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
WILLIAM EDGAR HOLDFORTH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
JOYCE LEA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
JOHN MCMAHON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
MRS SUE TAYLOR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
Keith James Drinkwater | Trustee |
|
||||||||
VIVIEN KERSHAW | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £273.73k | £355.99k | £771.79k | £307.74k | £333.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £397.45k | £491.04k | £495.22k | £567.10k | £474.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £315.16k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £2.74k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £453.89k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £495.22k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £1.56k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £77.22k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 14 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 14 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 01 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 01 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 09 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 09 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 01 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 01 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 28 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 28 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE METHODIST CHURCH ARE AND SHALL BE DEEMED TO HAVE BEEN SINCE THE DATE OF UNION THE ADVANCEMENT OF - (A) THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL STANDARDS AND THE DISCIPLINE OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (B) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CONNEXIONAL, DISTRICT, CIRCUIT, LOCAL OR OTHER ORGANISATION OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (C) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY SOCIETY OR INSTITUTION SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH; (D) ANY PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CHARITY BEING A CHARITY SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Bedworth Methodist Church
Mill Street
BEDWORTH
Warwickshire
CV12 8JZ
- Phone:
- 07517693474
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window