TELFORD METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To oversee, support and encourage 20 local Churches and Local Ecumencial Partnerships in fulfilling their aims by providing: a mission policy so that work can be developed and reviewed; full-time ministry personnel to support and enable that work; a Quarterly Plan of Services so that worship is available for all people; training for local volunteers; grants for property development.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income:
£688,518
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £231.97k | |
Other trading activities | £14.18k | |
Investments | £51.69k | |
Other | £390.68k |
Total expenditure:
£557,673
Raising funds | £2.98k | |
Charitable activities | £554.69k | |
Other | £0 |
£2,534 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £2.98k | |
Charitable expenditure | £554.69k | |
Retained for future use | £130.85k |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £2.98k | |
Charitable expenditure | £554.69k | |
Retained for future use | £133.38k |
People

9 Employee(s)
59 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Shropshire
- Telford & Wrekin
Governance
- 17 February 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
59 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Adrian Burdon | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mary Donaldson | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Eric Asiedu Boachie | Trustee | 13 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Comfort Esi Ellis | Trustee | 13 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Marcelle Kite | Trustee | 13 March 2024 |
|
|||||
Franklina Appiah | Trustee | 08 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Eric Boachie | Trustee | 08 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Tarrier | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
ALASTAIR JAMES BATTRICK | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Eudalia Virginia King | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Roger Jones | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Nik Wooller | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Edward Roger Dunlop | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Christine Harrison | Trustee | 23 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gail Hocking | Trustee | 28 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Tom Currie | Trustee | 28 August 2020 |
|
|||||
Jo Kudlacik | Trustee | 28 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev David Lavender | Trustee | 24 August 2020 |
|
|||||
Janet Bennett Ann | Trustee | 28 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Anne Lloyd | Trustee | 28 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Anne Cuthbert | Trustee | 06 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Busby-Waltho | Trustee | 01 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Bleasby | Trustee | 17 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
John Bowdler | Trustee | 17 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Shirley Stevens | Trustee | 12 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Angela Evans | Trustee | 11 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOYCE PRIDMORE | Trustee | 21 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD WALTER LANGLEY | Trustee | 21 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Diane Elizabeth Parkin | Trustee | 21 March 2018 |
|
|||||
Bill Tomlinson | Trustee | 05 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Marcus Branson | Trustee | 05 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Chris Rayner | Trustee | 23 November 2016 |
|
|||||
Mary Sheila Rudge | Trustee | 23 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Eileen Sarah Owen | Trustee | 23 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Diane Radford | Trustee | 23 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Lamkin | Trustee | 16 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Janet Lander | Trustee | 17 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Celia Pamela Talbot | Trustee | 29 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Elizabeth Lindley | Trustee | 31 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
REV DERRICK RODNEY LANDER | Trustee | 21 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT YAPP | Trustee | 24 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA MILLICENT KIDD | Trustee | 24 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET GRACE REYNOLDS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DEREK WILLIAM SHELDON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RUTH HILARY ELIZABETH COLE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BRIAN CLARKE OAKLEY | Trustee |
|
||||||
ALISON LANG | Trustee |
|
||||||
SYLVIA BAILEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANDREW INGRAHAM EVANS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RITA MARY POWELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JAMES CARROLL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR BRYYN THOMAS BEECH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN BRIAN PRATLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SHIRLEY ANN TOZE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN ANTHONY ADDISON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARGARET JOY MANTRIPP | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PHILIP DAVID OWEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID COLLINGTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JANE ANNE HOLDEN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £282.01k | £283.46k | £287.85k | £649.62k | £688.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £385.47k | £318.73k | £337.18k | £283.81k | £557.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £200 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1 | £14.18k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £240.33k | £231.97k | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £24.81k | £51.69k | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £384.28k | £390.68k | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £281.42k | £554.69k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.39k | £2.98k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.72m | £1.47m | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £56.30k | £58.84k | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | £549.28k | £930.12k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.94k | £2.94k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 14 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 14 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 18 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 18 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 13 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 13 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 20 February 2023 | 235 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 20 February 2023 | 235 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 22 December 2022 | 540 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 22 December 2022 | 540 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE METHODIST CHURCH ARE AND SHALL BE DEEMED TO HAVE BEEN SINCE THE DATE OF UNION THE ADVANCEMENT OF - (A) THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL STANDARDS AND THE DISCIPLINE OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (B) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CONNEXIONAL, DISTRICT, CIRCUIT, LOCAL OR OTHER ORGANISATION OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (C) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY SOCIETY OR INSTITUTION SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH; (D) ANY PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CHARITY BEING A CHARITY SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Dawley Christian Centre
High Street
Dawley
TELFORD
TF4 2EX
- Phone:
- 01952505108
- Website:
-
telfordmethodistcircuit.wordpress.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window