TECHFORTRADE CIO
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Helps relieve poverty by supporting concepts that use the latest thinking in technology and apply it to a trading challenge. Working with local entrepreneurs, techfortrade turns these concepts into sustainable social businesses that improve the livelihoods of the poor.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Kenya
Governance
- 06 September 2010: Standard registration
- 17 October 2022: Removed (Removed by application)
- 17 October 2022: Funds transferred to 1054041 TECH4ALL
- TECHFORTRADE (Working name)
- TECHFORTRADE LIMITED (Previous name)
- TRADE4ALL LIMITED (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2018 | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £157.42k | £24.97k | £18.81k | £23.47k | £500 | |
|
Total expenditure | £228.63k | £30.31k | £9.49k | £24.00k | £12.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £15.88k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 09 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 09 November 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 29 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 17 May 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 30 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 30 March 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 13 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 13 February 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION CONVERSION DATED 10 JAN 2019
Charitable objects
TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window