FOREST METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of sacred spaces (Buildings) for prayer and worship and halls for community activity.Supporting other charities in the UK and Overseas financially and with prayer. Involvement in ecumenical and inter-faith activities. Supporting the young and vulnerable in Church and community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income:
£585,135
Donations and legacies | £250.28k | |
Charitable activities | £273.21k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £61.65k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£530,559
Raising funds | £2.38k | |
Charitable activities | £528.18k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £2.38k | |
Charitable expenditure | £528.18k | |
Retained for future use | £54.58k |
People

7 Employee(s)
31 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Essex
- Redbridge
- Waltham Forest
Governance
- 18 February 2010: Standard registration
- 18 May 2021: Funds received from 1035018 CARE, HIGHAMS PARK
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
31 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Revd Dr Michael John Adrian Long | Chair | 01 September 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||||||
DALLION ROYE | Trustee | 15 January 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Eric Degreat Aidoo | Trustee | 28 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Stella Heskey | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Eunice Edwards | Trustee | 26 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Millicent Freeman | Trustee | 28 February 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Jojo N Monney | Trustee | 27 February 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Phyllis Anne Lloyd | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|||||||||||||||||
GRAHAM GEORGE BURGESS | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Rev Stephanie Njeru | Trustee | 21 July 2021 |
|
|||||||||||||||||
Elvena Bernita Brumant | Trustee | 07 June 2021 |
|
|||||||||||||||||
Andronica Mugombe | Trustee | 13 October 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Gary Ian Marshall | Trustee | 06 October 2019 |
|
|||||||||||||||||
Sharon Theresa Heather | Trustee | 19 September 2019 |
|
|||||||||||||||||
Jean Norton | Trustee | 19 September 2019 |
|
|||||||||||||||||
Rev Armstrong K Fummey | Trustee | 19 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Hazel Ann Mathews | Trustee | 19 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Leslie Victor Stowe | Trustee | 19 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Carole Dorothy Merriman | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Kathleen Rhoda Poole | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Rev Dr Jongikaya Zihle | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|||||||||||||||||
STEPHEN WILLIAM MURRAY | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|||||||||||||||||
Loyl Marcia Brandt | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|||||||||||||||||
Hannah Roberts | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|||||||||||||||||
Rev Susan Jane Creighton | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Pat Evans | Trustee | 01 March 2015 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
PATRICIA OVENDEN | Trustee | 01 March 2013 |
|
|||||||||||||||||
REV OSEIAS DA SILVA | Trustee | 01 September 2012 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
MARTIN HOWARTH | Trustee | 01 March 2012 |
|
|||||||||||||||||
Janet Elizabeth Tweedale | Trustee |
|
||||||||||||||||||
FLORESTINE CORBETT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £378.30k | £352.12k | £374.58k | £310.66k | £585.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £398.33k | £513.75k | £695.30k | £743.63k | £530.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £250.28k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £273.21k | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £61.65k | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £250.28k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £528.18k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.38k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £4.69k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £69.95k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.38k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £3.30m | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £4.26m | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.37m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £118.69k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 29 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 29 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 21 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 21 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE METHODIST CHURCH ARE AND SHALL BE DEEMED TO HAVE BEEN SINCE THE DATE OF UNION THE ADVANCEMENT OF - (A) THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL STANDARDS AND THE DISCIPLINE OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (B) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CONNEXIONAL, DISTRICT, CIRCUIT, LOCAL OR OTHER ORGANISATION OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (C) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY SOCIETY OR INSTITUTION SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH; (D) ANY PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CHARITY BEING A CHARITY SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Leytonstone High Rd Methodist Churc
Corner Lister & Leytonstone High Rd
E11 3DS
- Phone:
- 02085587645
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window