Financial history THE GEOGRAPHICAL ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1135148
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £1.11m £953.69k £1.07m £1.13m £1.27m
Total expenditure £1.05m £962.85k £1.27m £1.22m £1.32m
Income from government contracts £222.41k N/A N/A £13.72k N/A
Income from government grants £18.02k £52.73k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £25.21k £0 £10.02k £28 £124
Income - Other trading activities £48.36k £60.20k £66.88k £59.43k £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.01m £866.77k £958.42k £1.03m £1.16m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £20 £0 £0
Income - Investment £32.24k £26.73k £30.96k £40.82k £47.03k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £64.25k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £10.00k £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.03m £943.52k £1.25m £1.19m £1.31m
Expenditure - Raising funds £15.61k £19.33k £22.41k £27.00k £17.58k
Expenditure - Governance £28.31k £0 £16.93k £28.58k £39.98k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £15.61k £17.71k £22.41k £27.00k £17.58k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0