Financial history WEST HERTFORDSHIRE AND BORDERS METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity Number: 1135094
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £504.07k £520.33k £518.16k £1.50m £599.05k
Total expenditure £575.45k £558.98k £572.42k £611.09k £763.87k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £215 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £499.92k £518.73k £20.99k £1.45m £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £4.15k £1.60k £11.89k £35.18k £59.87k
Income - Other £0 £0 £485.06k £17.00k £539.19k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £574.82k £558.48k £572.42k £611.09k £763.87k
Expenditure - Raising funds £629 £498 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £3.48k £4.00k £4.20k £4.50k £4.50k
Expenditure - Grants institution £25.13k £4.11k £450 £56.13k £86.46k
Expenditure - Investment management £629 £498 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0