Financial history CORNERSTONE CHRISTIAN CENTRE (BROMLEY)

Charity number: 1135090
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £388.63k £374.86k £341.24k £341.17k £121.23k
Total expenditure £382.81k £360.89k £357.32k £357.32k £115.62k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A