CITIZENS ADVICE NEWCASTLE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Newcastle upon Tyne Citizens Advice Bureau (CAB) provides free, confidential, independent and impartial advice to people who live and work in the City. It promotes any charitable purposes for the benefit of the community in the North East region of England by the advancement of education, the protection of health and the relief of poverty, sickness and distress.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£949,665
Donations and legacies | £21.31k | |
Charitable activities | £919.25k | |
Other trading activities | £3.30k | |
Investments | £5.81k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£800,920
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £800.92k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £114,600 from 1 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £800.92k | |
Retained for future use | £148.75k |
People

24 Employee(s)
13 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 08 April 2010: Standard registration
- 10 June 2013: Funds received from 503661 NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE CITIZENS' ADVICE BUREAU
- NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU (Previous name)
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Suzanne Wood | Chair | 19 January 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Kevin Lynch | Trustee | 07 March 2025 |
|
|
||||||
Rev David Tubby | Trustee | 13 February 2025 |
|
|
||||||
Jemima Short | Trustee | 10 February 2025 |
|
|
||||||
Tribe Mkwebu | Trustee | 26 January 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Arshdeep Kaur | Trustee | 06 December 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Oliver Holmes | Trustee | 13 December 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Gillian Roll | Trustee | 13 December 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Stuart William Parker | Trustee | 10 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Angela Carver | Trustee | 12 September 2016 |
|
|
||||||
KEITH REED | Trustee | 29 November 2013 |
|
|
||||||
ANTHONY CRAWLEY | Trustee | 01 May 2012 |
|
|
||||||
RICHARD HARRIS | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £753.68k | £815.17k | £750.87k | £735.93k | £949.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £733.14k | £800.05k | £731.69k | £643.25k | £800.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £114.30k | £114.00k | £134.60k | £144.60k | £114.60k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £205.53k | £235.18k | £237.46k | £6.90k | £21.31k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £2.94k | £9.80k | £3.40k | £1.20k | £3.30k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £542.54k | £567.70k | £509.34k | £726.32k | £919.25k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £2.67k | £2.49k | £671 | £1.51k | £5.81k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £1.00k | £19.01k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £733.14k | £800.05k | £731.69k | £643.25k | £800.92k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £19.48k | £19.56k | £18.60k | £2.18k | £3.23k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £3.01k | £1.51k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £355.64k | £371.63k | £469.02k | £467.82k | £631.52k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £45.29k | £44.65k | £121.35k | £27.48k | £42.44k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 02 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 23 MARCH 1987 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 18 NOV 2016 as amended on 09 May 2022
Charitable objects
FOR THE PROMOTION OF ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN THE NORTH EAST REGION OF ENGLAND BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS.
Area of benefit
NORTH EAST REGION OF ENGLAND
Contact information
- Address:
-
4th Floor
City Library
Charles Avison Building
33 New Bridge Street West
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE1 8AX
- Phone:
- 01912292750
- Email:
- citycab@newcastlecab.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window