Financial history LOWESTOFT AND EAST SUFFOLK METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity Number: 1135624
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £141.77k £268.08k £141.28k £594.13k £165.57k
Total expenditure £205.05k £188.21k £165.69k £291.41k £204.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £24.20k N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £569.94k N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £291.41k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £384 N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A