CHORLEY AND LEYLAND METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Chorley & Leyland Circuit organises and resources ministers and local preachers to lead public worship open to all without charge. This takes place at each of the 11 Methodist Churches, including the one Local Ecumenical Partnership. All churches are encouraged to engage with the wider community, offering premises where appropriate. Trustees have had regard to the guidance on public benefit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income:
£928,289
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £921.84k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £6.10k | |
Other | £346 |
Total expenditure:
£1,020,975
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £1.02m | |
Other | £0 |
-£1,661 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.02m |
People

7 Employee(s)
44 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Lancashire
Governance
- 10 May 2010: Standard registration
- 14 September 2021: Funds received from 1063719 EUXTON CONTACT CENTRE
- CHORLEY METHODIST CIRCUIT (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
44 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RUTH MALARKEY | Trustee | 14 September 2022 |
|
|||||||
Rev Helen Margaret Millward | Trustee | 15 September 2021 |
|
|||||||
Louise Mary Taylor | Trustee | 16 March 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Karen Amanda Hilsden | Trustee | 16 September 2020 |
|
|||||||
Mark Saunders | Trustee | 17 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Leigh Naylor | Trustee | 17 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Ryan Francis Scott | Trustee | 17 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Gillian Fiona McBride | Trustee | 16 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Alan Edge | Trustee | 18 September 2018 |
|
|
||||||
COLIN NAYLOR | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||||
CAROL SHAPLEY | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Kath Owen | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||||
WILLIAM STAFFORD | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||||
DENNIS KELSALL | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||||
CHRISTINE TETLOW | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||||
CHRIS STAFFORD | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|||||||
Yvonne Lancaster | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||||
PHILIPPA GERRARD | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|||||||
Timothy James MELLING | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|||||||
SIMON HARDACRE | Trustee | 10 December 2014 |
|
|
||||||
MARGARET BIBBY | Trustee | 10 October 2014 |
|
|
||||||
Beryl Irene Frankish | Trustee | 28 March 2014 |
|
|
||||||
Raymond Duncan Frost | Trustee | 18 December 2013 |
|
|
||||||
Frank Robinson | Trustee | 18 December 2013 |
|
|
||||||
LINDA HESTON | Trustee | 02 October 2013 |
|
|
||||||
NORMA KLUNDER | Trustee | 01 August 2012 |
|
|||||||
YVONNE BEVERLEY TAYLOR | Trustee | 03 November 2011 |
|
|
||||||
JEFF WHITTLE | Trustee | 03 November 2011 |
|
|
||||||
DEACON SYLVIE ROSE NICHOLLS | Trustee | 27 October 2011 |
|
|
||||||
BRYAN ANTHONY NOON | Trustee | 27 October 2011 |
|
|
||||||
CAROLYN HOTHERSALL | Trustee | 27 October 2011 |
|
|||||||
DEACON ELLEN MONK WINSTANLEY | Trustee | 27 October 2011 |
|
|||||||
GEOFF HORTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
JIM FISHWICK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
CHRIS HOWARD | Trustee |
|
||||||||
KEITH JAMES ASHTON | Trustee |
|
||||||||
DAVID WILLIAM HULSE BSC | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
Rev ANDREW JOHN MASHITER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
Rev ROGER STUBBINGS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
SANDRA MERCER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
CHRIS HULSE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
JANET HAZEL HORTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
LINCOLN SHIELDS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
ANGELA ELIZABETH MELLING | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £364.96k | £546.64k | £383.92k | £314.31k | £928.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £403.46k | £416.41k | £388.93k | £392.93k | £1.02m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £288 | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £357.45k | N/A | N/A | £921.84k | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £12.98k | N/A | N/A | £6.10k | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £175.92k | N/A | N/A | £346 | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £416.41k | N/A | N/A | £1.02m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | £3.49k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | £1.31m | N/A | N/A | £1.13m | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | £207.51k | N/A | N/A | £222.58k | |
|
Other assets | N/A | £409.04k | N/A | N/A | £466.46k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | £103.92k | N/A | N/A | £79.17k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 29 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 29 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 08 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 08 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 09 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 09 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 21 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 21 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 08 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 08 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE METHODIST CHURCH ARE AND SHALL BE DEEMED TO HAVE BEEN SINCE THE DATE OF UNION THE ADVANCEMENT OF - (A) THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL STANDARDS AND THE DISCIPLINE OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (B) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CONNEXIONAL, DISTRICT, CIRCUIT, LOCAL OR OTHER ORGANISATION OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (C) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY SOCIETY OR INSTITUTION SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH; (D) ANY PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CHARITY BEING A CHARITY SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH.
Area of benefit
U8NDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
16 Little Close
Farington Moss
LEYLAND
PR26 6QU
- Phone:
- 01772 452572
- Email:
- revgill.mcbride@icloud.com
- Website:
-
chorleyandleylandmethodists.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window