WEST NORFOLK METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
West Norfolk Methodist Circuit offers opportunity for Christian worship and service in its 21 churches. It also makes its services available for baptisms, wedding and funerals as well as providing pastoral care. Several volunteers within the Methodist Church are Lay Preachers and many other volunteers take on roles to promote the religious ethos of the charity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

42 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Norfolk
Governance
- 03 June 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
42 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Paul Critchley | Chair | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Timothy Chaloner MA | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Richman Ncube PhD | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Janice MacQuade | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||
JOAN GREENING | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|||||||
Elizabeth MacLeod MA MCILIP | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Elspeth Hardy RGN DipICN | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Lesley Evans BSc PGCE | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Elinor Gudgeon | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Mike Wilkinson BA Hons | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Jacqueline Goddard | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Lynne Tonge BTh | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Stephanie Howard | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Sheila Johnson BA BSc QTS | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||||
LESLEY DENT | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
||||||
RALPH MICHAEL PERKINS | Trustee | 17 May 2013 |
|
|||||||
JOAN CARELESS | Trustee | 17 May 2013 |
|
|
||||||
Andrew John Hiles | Trustee | 17 May 2013 |
|
|||||||
DAVID SCOTNEY | Trustee | 17 May 2013 |
|
|||||||
HEATHER TITCOMB | Trustee | 17 May 2013 |
|
|||||||
MARY ROSE | Trustee | 17 May 2013 |
|
|
||||||
PHILIP JULIAN BATSTONE | Trustee | 17 May 2013 |
|
|
||||||
PAULINE SCOTNEY | Trustee | 17 May 2013 |
|
|
||||||
JEAN HARRINGTON | Trustee | 17 May 2013 |
|
|
||||||
JEAN DENNETT BSC | Trustee | 17 May 2013 |
|
|
||||||
STEPHEN HARRINGTON | Trustee | 17 May 2013 |
|
|
||||||
TERRY MARTIN | Trustee | 17 May 2013 |
|
|
||||||
VALERIE SHACKCLOTH | Trustee | 17 May 2013 |
|
|
||||||
MAUREEN HIBLING | Trustee | 17 May 2013 |
|
|
||||||
JOHN DAVIS | Trustee | 17 May 2013 |
|
|
||||||
ELIZABETH BATSTONE | Trustee | 17 May 2013 |
|
|
||||||
GLENYS REED | Trustee | 17 May 2013 |
|
|
||||||
RUTH HANNAY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
PETER ALBERT MASON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
PAULINE ANN DRIVER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
MR D DENT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
GILL ALLEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
CLIFF SHELTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
JOHN ROSPOPA | Trustee |
|
||||||||
MRS VYSE | Trustee |
|
||||||||
MRS MAGGIE BLOWERS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
JANET EILEEN MASON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £501.49k | £180.20k | £216.45k | £219.24k | £221.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £317.80k | £286.47k | £224.40k | £368.52k | £298.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £501.49k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £88.94k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £65.60k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £228.87k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 03 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 03 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 10 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 10 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 01 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 01 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 21 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 21 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 07 October 2020 | 99 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 07 October 2020 | 99 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE METHODIST CHURCH ARE AND SHALL BE DEEMED TO HAVE BEEN SINCE THE DATE OF UNION THE ADVANCEMENT OF - (A) THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL STANDARDS AND THE DISCIPLINE OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (B) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CONNEXIONAL, DISTRICT, CIRCUIT, LOCAL OR OTHER ORGANISATION OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (C) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY SOCIETY OR INSTITUTION SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH; (D) ANY PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CHARITY BEING A CHARITY SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Camomile Close
DOWNHAM MARKET
Norfolk
PE38 9UJ
- Phone:
- 01366 388 766
- Email:
- westnorfolkcircuit@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window