Financial history THE METHODIST CIRCUIT OF GLOUCESTERSHIRE

Charity Number: 1136205
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £1.14m £1.28m £1.30m £1.11m £1.56m
Total expenditure £1.08m £1.14m £1.14m £1.12m £1.35m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £804.83k £494.73k £537.10k £523.77k £781.52k
Income - Other trading activities £31.21k £32.08k £31.07k £30.78k £24.48k
Income - Charitable activities £96.44k £752.74k £725.22k £673.56k £684.01k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.88k £4.81k £2.34k £0 £68.54k
Income - Other £205.22k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.08m £1.14m £1.13m £1.12m £1.34m
Expenditure - Raising funds £4.72k £4.69k £5.44k £7.04k £8.40k
Expenditure - Governance £25.74k £47.21k £13.99k £14.21k £15.70k
Expenditure - Grants institution £42.32k £21.18k £40.54k £61.38k £64.56k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0