Financial history SOUTH HILL CHURCH (HEMEL HEMPSTEAD)

Charity number: 1137502
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £99.78k £87.49k £89.57k £88.83k £112.08k
Total expenditure £104.54k £85.45k £86.44k £82.78k £105.18k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A