Financial history HIGH WYCOMBE METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity Number: 1137104
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £276.65k £275.32k £265.58k £332.99k £336.35k
Total expenditure £296.49k £318.98k £289.36k £329.13k £611.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A