THE ENGLISH AMATEUR DANCESPORT ASSOCIATION LTD

Charity number: 1147259
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

EADA helps promote of community participation in healthy recreation by promoting amateur dancesport (Ballroom & Latin American dancing) for the public benefit. EADA acts as the voice of amateur dancers in England and helps provide support for amateur dancers of all levels. EADA aims to raise the profile of dance and thereby encouarge participation at a grassroots level.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023

Total income: £73
Total expenditure: £257

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Amateur Sport
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England

Governance

Registration history:
  • 15 May 2012: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • ENGLISH AMATEUR DANCEPORT ASSOCIATION LIMITED (Previous name)
  • ENGLISH AMATEUR DANCEPORT LIMITED (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Anthony Paul Clipstone Chair 01 April 2016
None on record
John Clark Gibson Trustee 01 April 2016
None on record
Peter Michael Jones Trustee 10 April 2012
THE DANCERS' FORGET ME NOT FUND
Received: On time
BLOC PRODUCTIONS
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2019 30/11/2020 30/11/2021 30/11/2022 30/11/2023
Total gross income £259 £3.45k £185 £1.36k £73
Total expenditure £729 £797 £202 £1.38k £257
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2023 15 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2022 28 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2021 28 February 2023 151 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2020 04 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2019 07 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
9 PROCTOR CLOSE
BRISTOL
BS4 5HT
Phone:
01179710871