COLCHESTER METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Circuit of Methodist Churches
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

33 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Essex
Governance
- 15 September 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
33 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Christine Pamela Preece | Chair | 01 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Brook Ann | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joan Mary Keeble | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gail Janette Chapman | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Derek Anthony Coe | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Hannah Chun | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Rev Ronald Metcalf Smith | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sally-Anne Crafer | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Clive Leonard Carrington | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
TRACEY CHAPMAN | Trustee | 17 March 2022 |
|
|||||
Diana Thompson | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Judith Anne Winward | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christine Joy Firmin | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Brook | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT JOHN FINCH | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Philip John Bingham | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Richard Pratt | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Violet Baker | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Tony Robert Trevers | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Alan Beesley | Trustee | 01 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
JOAN MOODY | Trustee | 01 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
GEOFFREY WILCOX | Trustee | 27 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD JAMES PETTIT | Trustee | 24 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
BETTY MAY RAMPLING | Trustee | 24 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET ANN CLUBB | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
EDWARD GEORGE PENTNEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NEIL ANDREW AUSTIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RON FIRMIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RACHEL VAN STAVEREN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr GEOFFREY CHARLES CASEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
VIVIAN MARY WILCOX | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JUDITH ANN FLETCHER | Trustee |
|
||||||
JOHN EDWARD JONES | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £209.24k | £177.37k | £181.68k | £184.75k | £223.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £204.15k | £178.03k | £226.55k | £213.54k | £179.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 20 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 20 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 11 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 11 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 28 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 28 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 30 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 30 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE METHODIST CHURCH ARE AND SHALL BE DEEMED TO HAVE BEEN SINCE THE DATE OF UNION THE ADVANCEMENT OF - (A) THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL STANDARDS AND THE DISCIPLINE OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (B) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CONNEXIONAL, DISTRICT, CIRCUIT, LOCAL OR OTHER ORGANISATION OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (C) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY SOCIETY OR INSTITUTION SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH; (D) ANY PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CHARITY BEING A CHARITY SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CASTLE METHODIST CHURCH
MAIDENBURGH STREET
COLCHESTER
ESSEX
CO1 1TT
- Phone:
- 01206 545253
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window