EPSOM METHODIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1127787
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provide public acts of worship/sacred space for church members/non-members Teach Christianity in sermons/courses/small groups Visit sick/bereaved Promote Christianity in events/services Provide youth/senior citizen/women clubs with Christian ethos Promote mission of church in activities for older people/parent/toddler groups Support charities in the UK/overseas financially/with prayer

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Surrey

Governance

Registration history:
  • 30 January 2009: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • EMC (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

22 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Catherine Hutton Chair 01 September 2020
None on record
Chun Wing Simon Wong FRCSEd Trustee 21 May 2024
None on record
Joana Sarpong Trustee 21 May 2024
None on record
Jerry Wai Chung Lee Trustee 07 November 2023
None on record
JOHN LAWRENCE RILEY Trustee 27 June 2023
None on record
Neil Andrew Dallen MBE Trustee 27 June 2023
HOPE INTO ACTION - EPSOM
Received: On time
EPSOM FIREWORKS DISPLAY CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
EPSOM REPAIR CAFE
Received: On time
EPSOM AND EWELL DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL
Received: On time
EPSOM PAROCHIAL CHARITIES
Received: On time
NEAT HQ
Recently registered
Christine Cox Trustee 27 June 2023
SUTTON METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Joshua James Selfe Trustee 01 November 2022
None on record
Kammy Chong Trustee 01 November 2022
None on record
Jianwen Laing ACCA/FCCA Trustee 01 November 2022
None on record
Anthony Harold Blakeburn Trustee 14 July 2022
None on record
Katharine Lindsey Castledine BA FCA CTA Trustee 14 June 2022
SUTTON METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Sarah Louise Meech BA Trustee 14 June 2022
None on record
Andrew Robert Meech BSc MRICS Trustee 14 June 2022
None on record
ANN VERONICA ARTHUR Trustee 05 July 2021
None on record
Robert Douglas Hill BA Trustee 05 July 2021
SUTTON METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Mark Angel Trustee 05 July 2021
SUTTON METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Pamela Jane Brogan Trustee 26 May 2020
None on record
Gillian Brenda Mead Trustee 26 May 2020
None on record
Jane Rosemary Barden Trustee 21 April 2018
None on record
Rev Ung soon Nguang Trustee 24 April 2017
None on record
RICHARD THORBURN SMITH BSC CENG Trustee 04 June 2003
SUTTON METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £548.58k £531.71k £473.39k £512.51k £580.61k
Total expenditure £578.93k £505.14k £457.53k £520.55k £595.44k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £6.12k
Income from government grants N/A £60.63k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £456.70k £312.05k N/A £315.73k £332.82k
Income - Other trading activities £82.01k £13.20k N/A £11.10k £13.20k
Income - Charitable activities £0 £176.57k N/A £179.64k £216.31k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment £9.56k £7.28k N/A £6.04k £18.29k
Income - Other £309 £22.60k N/A £0 £0
Income - Legacies £14.43k £58.69k N/A £10.93k £1.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £369.59k £493.56k N/A £508.52k £574.43k
Expenditure - Raising funds £137.16k £6.01k N/A £1.18k £1.33k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 N/A £1.68k £1.92k
Expenditure - Grants institution £38.10k £0 N/A £0 £3.50k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 N/A £0 £1.33k
Expenditure - Other £72.18k £5.57k N/A £10.85k £19.68k

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Own use assets £1.99m £1.96m N/A £1.95m £1.86m
Long-term investments £0 £10.00k N/A £10.00k £88.19k
Other assets £801.32k £802.83k N/A £891.14k £816.79k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Total liabilities £49.08k £8.44k N/A £67.33k £7.69k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 17 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 17 March 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 10 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 10 February 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 14 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 14 April 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 11 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 11 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 11 February 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 11 February 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
13 HAZON WAY
EPSOM
KT19 8HD
Phone:
01372726042