CROYDON METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious activities in Croydon
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

51 Trustee(s)
700 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Croydon
Governance
- 11 May 2009: Previously excepted registration
No other names
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
51 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Karen George | Chair | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
Yvonne Fraser | Trustee | 08 February 2025 |
|
|
||||||||||
Deacon Allyson Henry | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
Rev Jonathan Dean | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|||||||||||
Beatrice Lewis | Trustee | 13 March 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
Simon Mark Tayler | Trustee | 09 August 2023 |
|
|||||||||||
Oluwatoyin Folasade Ogunyemi | Trustee | 09 August 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
Christine Angela Elliott | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
Tirena Gunter | Trustee | 01 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
Pauline Foster | Trustee | 01 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
Rev Juliet Chirevesa Ushewokunze | Trustee | 02 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
Alberta Larkai-Doherty | Trustee | 09 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Mary Elizabeth Salter | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Rev Gyula Fiak | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Rev Richard Michael Lowson | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|||||||||||
Eunice Boadu | Trustee | 12 March 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Adrian John Pickett | Trustee | 18 October 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||
Desmond Sonny Williams | Trustee | 15 September 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||
SIAN ELIZABETH WILLIAMS | Trustee | 13 September 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||
Sonia Elaine Smith | Trustee | 20 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||
Adebukola Abisola Lawal | Trustee | 10 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||
Byron Asbruce | Trustee | 10 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||
Ola Ogunyemi | Trustee | 10 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||
Dunstana Adeshola Davies | Trustee | 06 October 2020 |
|
|||||||||||
Rev Jennifer Margaret Potter | Trustee | 05 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||
Rev Leslie John Griffiths | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||
Andrew Thynne | Trustee | 30 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||
Gillian Mary Haslam | Trustee | 18 November 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||
ELIZABETH HELEN SMART | Trustee | 08 October 2019 |
|
|||||||||||
David Robert Tayler FCA | Trustee | 08 October 2019 |
|
|||||||||||
Paul Mervyn Parkinson | Trustee | 08 July 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||
Sukhvinder Kalsi CIMA | Trustee | 03 October 2018 |
|
|||||||||||
Tolulola Olusegun Lawal | Trustee | 05 September 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||
Miss Fran Byard | Trustee | 07 June 2018 |
|
|||||||||||
John Frederick Anstey | Trustee | 06 July 2017 |
|
|
||||||||||
MISS JENNIE HALL | Trustee | 11 June 2015 |
|
|
||||||||||
CONSTANTIA PENNIE | Trustee | 10 June 2015 |
|
|
||||||||||
Professor Lawrie Bannister | Trustee | 18 February 2015 |
|
|||||||||||
Ruth Lilian Tayler | Trustee | 14 September 2014 |
|
|
||||||||||
ROBIN HASLAM | Trustee | 16 September 2013 |
|
|
||||||||||
HUGH BASIL ROBERTS | Trustee | 10 September 2012 |
|
|
||||||||||
ADRIAN HOWE | Trustee | 10 September 2012 |
|
|
||||||||||
MRS TRUDY NARTEY | Trustee | 27 March 2012 |
|
|
||||||||||
ROHINI HERAT | Trustee | 24 March 2011 |
|
|||||||||||
ALAN FREDERICK MILLS | Trustee |
|
||||||||||||
MR J HOPESON-SOWAH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||
LINDA BARBARA ANN WHITE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||
DOREEN LILIAN GRACE RIDDEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||
PAULINE MADGE LITTLE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||
ANN ELIZABETH ATKINS BSC | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||
PAUL RICHARD TAYLOR | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £339.44k | £329.13k | £286.92k | £271.90k | £311.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £373.55k | £325.44k | £337.74k | £336.60k | £267.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 02 July 2023 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 02 July 2023 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 01 September 2022 | 63 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 01 September 2022 | 63 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 01 July 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 01 July 2021 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)
Charitable objects
The purposes of the Methodist Church are and shall be deemed to have been since the date of union the advancement of - (a) the Christian faith in accordance with the doctrinal standards and the dicipline of the Methodist Church; (b) any charitable purpose for the time being of any Connexional, district, circuit, local or other organisation of the Methodist Church; (c) any charitable purpose for the time being of any society or institution subsiduary or ancillary to the Methodist Church; (d) any purpose for the time being of any charity being a charity subsidiary or ancillary to the Methodist Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Croydon Methodist Circuit
c/o West Croydon Methodist Church
93 London Road
Croydon
CR0 2RF
- Phone:
- 02087749356
- Email:
- office@croydonmeth.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window