Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHRIST CHURCH SELLY PARK
Charity number: 1127755

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Jane Rebecca Clarke | Trustee | 27 January 2025 |
|
|||||
Susan Haynes | Trustee | 20 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Graham Lee Romp | Trustee | 20 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
James Jonathan Williams | Trustee | 14 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen James Thomas | Trustee | 14 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Miriam Valerie Banting | Trustee | 14 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Carey Mason | Trustee | 14 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Ward | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Crooks | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter Edward Michael Frere | Trustee | 30 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kathleen Routley | Trustee | 30 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Benjamin Charles Green | Trustee | 03 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Janet Chalmers | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
ADRIAN LAURENCE JONES | Trustee | 10 April 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.