REDHILL METHODIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Redhill Methodist Church gives opportunity for Christian worship and fellowship but at the same time provides a variety of unconditional care for the local community and beyond.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

24 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Surrey
Governance
- 31 July 2009: Previously excepted registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
24 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Frederick Lambley | Trustee | 01 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Romana Khan | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Shruthi Suresh Babu | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
JANET MAY LOADER | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Zeenat Nadeem Gill | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Pitts | Trustee | 01 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Derek May | Trustee | 01 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Irene Goodhind | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Chitradevi Jaganathan | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Raseen Joseph | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Peter | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Gillian Rosemary Baalham | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christopher James Lawrence | Trustee | 01 May 2020 |
|
|||||
Anne Catherine Branson Mrs | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rex William Giles | Trustee | 01 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Heather Snowdon | Trustee | 07 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Robert Willock | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|||||
ELIZABETH GREGORY | Trustee | 28 August 2012 |
|
|||||
Helen Greaves | Trustee | 04 September 2011 |
|
|||||
GILLIAN GEORGE | Trustee | 04 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
PAULINE JANET NEWTON | Trustee |
|
||||||
MR K J NEWBURY | Trustee |
|
||||||
MRS R E WILLOCK | Trustee |
|
||||||
DAVID EDWARD PENNA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £195.94k | £156.68k | £134.60k | £152.87k | £159.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £158.58k | £147.35k | £137.03k | £217.44k | £169.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 22 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 22 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 23 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 23 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 17 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 17 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 22 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 22 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 27 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 27 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)
Charitable objects
The purposes of the Methodist Church are and shall be deemed to have been since the date of union the advancement of - (a) the Christian faith in accordance with the doctrinal standards and the dicipline of the Methodist Church; (b) any charitable purpose for the time being of any Connexional, district, circuit, local or other organisation of the Methodist Church; (c) any charitable purpose for the time being of any society or institution subsiduary or ancillary to the Methodist Church; (d) any purpose for the time being of any charity being a charity subsidiary or ancillary to the Methodist Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 PARK ROAD
REDHILL
RH1 1BT
- Phone:
- 01737760292
- Email:
- info@redhillmethodist.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window