Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ECCLESALL, SHEFFIELD

Charity number: 1128859
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £583.08k £622.57k £669.51k £697.72k £753.73k
Total expenditure £573.48k £675.31k £657.07k £690.81k £746.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.15k N/A £21.46k £4.23k £6.42k
Income - Donations and legacies £479.42k £471.72k £455.65k £483.82k £476.93k
Income - Other trading activities £25.17k £50.26k £74.38k £67.99k £78.02k
Income - Charitable activities £64.02k £85.17k £97.28k £98.75k £147.13k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £14.48k £15.42k £42.20k £47.17k £51.65k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £22.01k £2.50k £32.00k £8.17k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £573.48k £675.31k £657.07k £690.81k £746.17k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £11.18k £8.65k £9.46k £13.74k £14.36k
Expenditure - Grants institution £28.15k £31.24k £32.71k £31.73k £40.39k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0