Trustees THE METHODIST CHURCH - BARNSLEY CIRCUIT

Charity number: 1135240
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

33 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Josephine Powell Trustee 10 February 2025
None on record
Angela Findlow Trustee 01 December 2024
None on record
Nigel Kenneth Bonson Trustee 01 September 2024
The Methodist Church Barnsley North West
Received: On time
Janice Dorothy Parkin Trustee 01 June 2024
None on record
Gwenyth Harrison Trustee 01 March 2024
The Methodist Church Barnsley North West
Received: On time
Dianne Charlesworth Trustee 01 March 2024
THE METHODIST CHURCH BARNSLEY NORTH EAST
Received: On time
Rev Lyn Patricia Gregg Trustee 01 September 2023
The Methodist Church Barnsley North West
Received: On time
Wan Foong Loh Trustee 13 July 2023
The Methodist Church Barnsley North West
Received: On time
Joan Haywood Trustee 13 July 2023
THE METHODIST CHURCH BARNSLEY SOUTH
Received: On time
Jennifer Pearson Trustee 29 March 2023
None on record
John Pearson Trustee 29 March 2023
None on record
Carol Jewkes Trustee 21 November 2022
None on record
Alison Padgett Trustee 01 June 2022
None on record
Christine Margaret Harrington Trustee 01 June 2022
The Methodist Church Barnsley North West
Received: On time
DAPHNE IRWIN Trustee 01 March 2022
THE METHODIST CHURCH BARNSLEY NORTH EAST
Received: On time
Anne Elizabeth Hamby Trustee 01 September 2020
None on record
Deborah Ann Evans Trustee 01 September 2019
None on record
Linda Joyce Stammers Trustee 01 September 2019
THE METHODIST CHURCH BARNSLEY NORTH EAST
Received: On time
DAWN WEBSTER Trustee 01 September 2017
None on record
CLAIRE RAWLINSON Trustee 01 September 2017
None on record