Trustees EMSWORTH METHODIST CHURCH
Charity number: 1127747

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev David John Muskett | Chair | 01 January 2020 |
|
|||||
Nigel Roderick Bloodworth | Trustee | 01 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
PAMELA MARGARET EARDLEY | Trustee | 01 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Mary Hall | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Norman Thomas | Trustee | 30 November 2024 |
|
|||||
Gillian Richardson | Trustee | 01 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Marilyn Jane Carroll | Trustee | 01 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Deacon Stephen John Richardson | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Diana Christina Elizabeth Elliott | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Peter John Gregory BSc PhD | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Marian Hughes | Trustee | 01 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
ALAN JOHN HICKOX | Trustee | 01 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
VERONICA HICKOX | Trustee | 23 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
DIANA HARRIS | Trustee | 16 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET ANN SAWYER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS DOT WARREN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID JONATHAN SAWYER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS GILL COOPER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GEOFFREY WILLIAM EARDLEY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.