Financial history NORTH EAST SOMERSET & BATH METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity number: 1129520
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £976.31k £523.08k £772.39k £536.49k £573.10k
Total expenditure £621.37k £698.31k £882.25k £762.94k £905.82k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £3.61k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £524.09k £62.19k £319.25k £53.68k £40.52k
Income - Other trading activities £64.39k £50.53k £68.21k £80.32k £87.29k
Income - Charitable activities £369.35k £378.30k £372.12k £367.44k £368.01k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £6.57k £3.60k £6.67k £29.78k £42.18k
Income - Other £11.91k £28.47k £6.13k £5.28k £35.11k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £621.37k £698.31k £858.40k £762.94k £901.70k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £4.13k
Expenditure - Governance £11.44k £13.76k £15.70k £18.04k £14.09k
Expenditure - Grants institution £323 £5.00k £62.12k £62.33k £32.55k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £23.85k £0 £0