Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. PETER, FORMBY

Charity Number: 1128383
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £170.65k £191.71k £231.27k £358.03k £253.25k
Total expenditure £199.96k £223.52k £232.58k £381.30k £250.56k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £1.31k N/A £22.49k N/A