THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS WOODFORD WELLS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Public worship open to all. Promoting the mission of the Church through activities for senior citizens, parents and toddlers, other special needs groups. Youth and children's activities with a Christian ethos. Pastoral work including the sick and bereaved. Teaching Christianity in varied groups and schools. Supporting Christian Mission organisations worldwide. Providing community activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£1,306,091
Donations and legacies | £955.26k | |
Charitable activities | £209.31k | |
Other trading activities | £8.80k | |
Investments | £36.31k | |
Other | £96.41k |
Total expenditure:
£1,252,714
Raising funds | £2.55k | |
Charitable activities | £1.25m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £2.55k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.25m | |
Retained for future use | £53.38k |
People

15 Employee(s)
19 Trustee(s)
200 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Essex
- Redbridge
- Waltham Forest
Governance
- 12 February 2009: Previously excepted registration
- PCC OF ALL SAINTS WITH ST ANDREWS WOODFORD (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Green | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lydia Joiner | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Marcus Giddy | Trustee | 12 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joshua Harry Green | Trustee | 16 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
SHEILA JEANETTE OAKES | Trustee | 16 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Mary Nunns | Trustee | 14 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLAS JOHN GRAY | Trustee | 18 April 2021 |
|
|||||
Daniel Vickers | Trustee | 18 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev David Baker | Trustee | 31 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Mark Castleton | Trustee | 30 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Terence Newton Stamp | Trustee | 15 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Paul Victor Sherrington | Trustee | 17 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Stella Margaret Redburn BEd ALCM | Trustee | 26 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Josephine Winifred Smith | Trustee | 27 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
GILLIAN WENDY HAMPTON | Trustee | 23 May 2013 |
|
|||||
HEATHER HOUSDEN | Trustee | 12 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
ANNE MARIE SACHS | Trustee | 18 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
Frank Hawkins | Trustee | 18 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
REVEREND PAUL GEORGE HARCOURT MA | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.21m | £1.05m | £1.03m | £1.08m | £1.31m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.10m | £1.11m | £1.05m | £1.12m | £1.25m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £925.68k | £830.20k | £847.23k | £817.67k | £955.26k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £12.77k | £4.43k | £0 | £8.16k | £8.80k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £249.22k | £179.60k | £0 | £212.27k | £209.31k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £4.43k | £2.58k | £0 | £11.59k | £36.31k | |
|
Income - Other | £22.53k | £37.57k | £0 | £29.23k | £96.41k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £122.42k | £220.00k | £13.50k | £154 | £226.57k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.08m | £1.11m | £1.04m | £1.12m | £1.25m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £1.47k | £346 | £1.29k | £1.29k | £2.55k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £25.38k | £24.20k | £0 | £24.26k | £24.65k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £43.26k | £118.38k | £0 | £137.52k | £57.87k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £13.93k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £2.10m | £2.08m | £2.07m | £2.06m | £2.59m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £1.15m | £1.10m | £1.09m | £1.06m | £588.17k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £69.82k | £48.87k | £50.00k | £50.38k | £54.51k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 12 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 23 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 November 2021 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 08 November 2021 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 19 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ALL SAINTS PARISH OFFICE
REAR OF ALL SAINTS CHURCH
INMANS ROW
WOODFORD GREEN
IG8 0NH
- Phone:
- 02085040266
- Email:
- contact@asww.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window