Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HARDINGTON VALE

Charity Number: 1128078
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £121.70k £234.77k £178.06k £263.56k £405.89k
Total expenditure £115.07k £185.35k £162.38k £208.85k £421.03k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £38.30k N/A N/A N/A