Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. ANDREW AND ST. MARY MAGDALENE, MAIDENHEAD

Charity Number: 1127589
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

24 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Michael David Saunders Trustee 01 May 2025
HENRY CHILDREN'S ORTHOPAEDIC TRUST
Received: On time
NEVEREST ORTHOPAEDICS FOUNDATION
Received: 37 days late
Andrew James Fielding Trustee 01 May 2025
FLORENCE ANNIE CRUMP MEMORIAL FUND
Received: On time
ANN SEYMOUR'S CHARITY
Received: On time
WYVILL'S CHARITY
Received: On time
Paul Leddington Wright Trustee 01 May 2025
None on record
Catherine Mary Lant Trustee 01 May 2025
None on record
Olayinka Abolaji Obire Trustee 01 May 2025
None on record
Alison May Napier Trustee 01 May 2025
None on record
Elizabeth Anne Gilbert Trustee 01 May 2025
None on record
Emma Spear Trustee 18 April 2024
None on record
Robin Aghoghovbia Trustee 18 April 2024
None on record
Rev Adam Curtis Trustee 12 September 2023
None on record
Frances Elizabeth Montgomerie Trustee 12 September 2023
None on record
Gestina Gracy Vijaya Crane Trustee 18 October 2021
None on record
Anthony Kan Trustee 12 October 2021
None on record
Lindsay Reisser-Weston Trustee 11 October 2021
None on record
Linsley Adrian Green Trustee 22 April 2021
None on record
Daniel Mbusi Sajabi Matovu Trustee 03 September 2020
None on record
Rev Ian Miller Trustee 09 July 2019
None on record
Phebe Tay Trustee 25 April 2019
None on record
RHYS JONES MITCHELL Trustee 27 April 2017
None on record
Rev JONATHAN CHARLES DRAKE Trustee 01 June 2016
None on record
Neil James McDonald Trustee 19 April 2016
None on record
MRS KATE WHEATLEY Trustee 09 June 2011
None on record
ROB WINGFIELD Trustee 09 June 2011
None on record
PETER JOHN BLACKBEARD Trustee
None on record