BROADSTONE METHODIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PLACE OF WORSHIP AND COMMUNITY WORK
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

18 Trustee(s)
80 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Poole
Governance
- 03 February 2009: Previously excepted registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRISTINE MAGUIRE | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Diane Skinner | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Annette Brooke | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Deacon Gill Judge | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sylvia Kingston | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Jean Talbot | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Alison Margaret Sclater | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
MARILYN GREENAWAY | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOHN WILLIAM GREENAWAY | Trustee | 30 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
EDWINA GOULD | Trustee | 01 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
DAVID MICHAEL SPRACKLEN | Trustee | 01 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
ANN THORNTON | Trustee | 01 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
ROSEANNE FIELD | Trustee | 01 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
ROGER MICHAEL JACKSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KEITH WHARMBY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JUDITH MARGARET HEWINS | Trustee |
|
||||||
JOAN MARY JACKSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CAROL ANNE LE POIDEVIN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £137.33k | £140.28k | £111.37k | £136.06k | £132.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £151.17k | £83.58k | £130.08k | £123.90k | £130.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 25 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 25 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 24 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 24 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 23 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 23 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 04 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 04 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 04 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 04 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)
Charitable objects
The purposes of the Methodist Church are and shall be deemed to have been since the date of union the advancement of - (a) the Christian faith in accordance with the doctrinal standards and the dicipline of the Methodist Church; (b) any charitable purpose for the time being of any Connexional, district, circuit, local or other organisation of the Methodist Church; (c) any charitable purpose for the time being of any society or institution subsiduary or ancillary to the Methodist Church; (d) any purpose for the time being of any charity being a charity subsidiary or ancillary to the Methodist Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
210 LOWER BLANDFORD ROAD
BROADSTONE
BH18 8DP
- Phone:
- 01202600696
- Website:
-
WWW.BROADSTONEMETHODIST.ORG.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window