MID GLAMORGAN MISSION OF THE METHODIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE MID GLAMORGAN MISSION CIRCUIT ACTS AS THE UMBRELLA BODY AND A RESOURCE PROVIDER FOR ALL OF THE METHODIST CHURCHES WITHIN OUR CIRCUIT BOUNDARY
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

30 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Caerphilly
- Merthyr Tydfil
- Rhondda Cynon Taff
Governance
- 23 February 2009: Previously excepted registration
- MGM (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
30 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Malcolm Peacock | Chair | 01 September 2022 |
|
|||||||
Dorothy Grace Jones | Trustee | 16 March 2025 |
|
|
||||||
Emily F C Barry | Trustee | 16 March 2025 |
|
|
||||||
Anita Jones | Trustee | 16 March 2025 |
|
|
||||||
Gaynor Mary Logan | Trustee | 16 March 2025 |
|
|
||||||
HELEN AVERY | Trustee | 16 March 2025 |
|
|
||||||
Philip Maurice Steel BSC CEng | Trustee | 05 June 2019 |
|
|
||||||
WYNDHAM DAVID DAVIES | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Janet Evans | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||||
James Peter Hall | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Beverley Maureen Fletcher | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||||
John Lewis Cullwick | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|||||||
Ann Cooke BA Dip ED | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||||
Yvonne Savage | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||||
Paul Cooke B Pharm | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||||
Ronald John Edmunds | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||||
CLIVE JAMES GARDNER | Trustee | 25 March 2012 |
|
|
||||||
MERVYN RICHARD PUGH CPFA | Trustee | 23 October 2011 |
|
|
||||||
TIMOTHY JAMES DAVIES BSC | Trustee | 20 September 2011 |
|
|
||||||
DIANE COLLIER STOLTMAN | Trustee | 20 September 2011 |
|
|
||||||
GILLIAN DOROTHY GARDNER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
YVONNE THOMAS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
Gloria Vera Harris | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
TEFWEN MARY GEORGE MED | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
Paul Jonathan Savage MSC | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
PHYLLIS PAVELTISH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
AVRIL BARRY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
CAROL EDMUNDS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
GILLIAN ANN BERRY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
GLENIS HUNT BSC DIP ED | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £218.67k | £425.61k | £197.17k | £102.81k | £216.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £189.79k | £255.57k | £308.98k | £124.34k | £109.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 04 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 04 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 16 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 16 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 25 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 25 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 24 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 24 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)
Charitable objects
The purposes of the Methodist Church are and shall be deemed to have been since the date of union the advancement of - (a) the Christian faith in accordance with the doctrinal standards and the dicipline of the Methodist Church; (b) any charitable purpose for the time being of any Connexional, district, circuit, local or other organisation of the Methodist Church; (c) any charitable purpose for the time being of any society or institution subsiduary or ancillary to the Methodist Church; (d) any purpose for the time being of any charity being a charity subsidiary or ancillary to the Methodist Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Golwg Yr Afon
ABERDARE
Mid Glamorgan
CF44 0DQ
- Phone:
- 01685673834
- Email:
- rev.m.peacock@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window