SOUTHWARK GROUP OF TENANTS ORGANISATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promote the rights of tenants and control over their housing and environment by information sharing between the organisation and the local authority Extend the right of all tenants to participate and be consulted in the formulation of council polices on housing and associated issues, and to be represented on all matters and policies that involve tenants and their homes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £228,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Southwark
Governance
- 09 June 2009: Standard registration
- SGTO (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mohamed Dris | Trustee | 25 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kyle Simmonds | Trustee | 27 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Gilmartin | Trustee | 27 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Chris Meregini | Trustee | 28 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emmanuel Ojomo | Trustee | 28 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christina Metibemu | Trustee | 28 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Althea Smith | Trustee | 28 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Saidat Oketunde | Trustee | 28 September 2022 |
|
|||||
AL-issa Munu | Trustee | 28 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Johnson McCalthy | Trustee | 28 September 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £253.73k | £231.05k | £235.67k | £276.00k | £277.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £276.37k | £225.62k | £228.02k | £239.00k | £259.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £228.46k | £228.20k | £216.92k | £228.00k | £228.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 07 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 23 OCTOBER 2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 8 APRIL 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 08 MAR 2017
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF SOUTHWARK BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND RESIDENTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO IMPROVE THE LIFE OF THE INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
BELLS GARDENS COMMUNITY CENTRE
19 BULLER CLOSE
PECKHAM
LONDON
SE15 6UJ
- Phone:
- 02076396718
- Email:
- info@sgto.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window