SOLIHULL METHODIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Public acts of worship open to members of the church and non-members. The teaching of Christianity through sermons, courses & groups. Pastoral work including visiting the sick & bereaved. The provision of meetings with a Christian ethos for all ages. Making the premises available to outside organisations & establishing Christian contact wherever possible. Supporting charities in the UK & overseas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

44 Trustee(s)
45 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Solihull
Governance
- 22 January 2009: Previously excepted registration
No other names
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
44 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Molly Chitokwindo MA | Chair | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||
Karen Jane Handford | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
Ian Russell Hancock | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|||||||||||
Yan Yeung | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|||||||||||
Peter Anthony Farndon | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|||||||||||
Christine Mary Burr | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
Jacqueline Patricia Lancaster | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
Adeyimka Gbadebo | Trustee | 30 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
Abigail Rose Godfree | Trustee | 11 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
Roger Wellings | Trustee | 11 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
Deborah Margaret Install | Trustee | 11 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
Alison Faulkner | Trustee | 11 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
Lawrence James Day | Trustee | 06 February 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
Rev Cleopas Sibanda | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|||||||||||
Rev Farai Mapamula | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|||||||||||
Glen Mullineux MAMScDPhil | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Elizabeth Jayne Pickles BEd | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Richard George Burr BSc | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Sian Louise Musgreave-Spiby BA | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Graham Stuart Mackenzie | Trustee | 07 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Caroline Elizabeth Hinchliffe | Trustee | 08 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||
Peter James Austin | Trustee | 08 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||
Karen Jayne Robertson | Trustee | 08 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||
Catherine Coleman BA Hons | Trustee | 10 June 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||
SUSAN KATHRYN KELLY | Trustee | 10 June 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||
Alan Faulkner B.Phil Ed. | Trustee | 01 June 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||
FIONA MARY BEADLE | Trustee | 01 June 2017 |
|
|
||||||||||
Derek Richard Giles | Trustee | 01 June 2017 |
|
|
||||||||||
JANE GARNETT BSC PGCE | Trustee | 01 June 2017 |
|
|
||||||||||
Jonathan Tuckey | Trustee | 01 February 2017 |
|
|
||||||||||
Diane Webb | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||||||||
JUDITH ANN LINGARD | Trustee | 14 October 2014 |
|
|
||||||||||
CHRISTOPHER TUCKER | Trustee | 21 October 2013 |
|
|
||||||||||
ANDREW DAVID HUNT | Trustee | 21 October 2013 |
|
|
||||||||||
HELEN JUDITH BANKS | Trustee | 31 May 2012 |
|
|
||||||||||
PAMELA MARY BEATTIE | Trustee | 31 May 2012 |
|
|
||||||||||
Rev CHRISTINE GILES | Trustee | 20 February 2012 |
|
|
||||||||||
MRS JENNI KITSON | Trustee | 25 January 2012 |
|
|||||||||||
JUDITH FARNDON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||
MARJORIE ANNE ROPER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||
ANN MARGARET POLSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||
CHRISTINE LAURA COOKE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||
MARGERY BENSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||
DAVID ALASTAIR GREY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £496.79k | £219.36k | £258.10k | £301.08k | £324.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £254.33k | £214.00k | £248.74k | £294.59k | £334.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 24 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 24 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 13 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 13 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 29 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 29 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 24 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 24 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 12 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 12 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)
Charitable objects
The purposes of the Methodist Church are and shall be deemed to have been since the date of union the advancement of - (a) the Christian faith in accordance with the doctrinal standards and the dicipline of the Methodist Church; (b) any charitable purpose for the time being of any Connexional, district, circuit, local or other organisation of the Methodist Church; (c) any charitable purpose for the time being of any society or institution subsiduary or ancillary to the Methodist Church; (d) any purpose for the time being of any charity being a charity subsidiary or ancillary to the Methodist Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
SOLIHULL METHODIST CHURCH
BLOSSOMFIELD ROAD
SOLIHULL
B91 1LG
- Phone:
- 01217057367
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window