GO MAD IN TANZANIA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
GoMAD is set up to provide volunteers with the opportunity to make a difference in a rural community in Northern Tanzania, specifically the Diocese of Mara. Our volunteer teams ÔÇô either on a 3-month or 2 week placement get involved in a range of activities: Build a house and/or church Construct pit latrines, also water tanks Assist in the local orphanage Be involved in HIV/AIDS education
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
134 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Human Resources
- Throughout London
- Kenya
- Tanzania
Governance
- 02 April 2009: Standard registration
- GOMAD (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JEREMY PAUL GREEN | Chair | 09 January 2018 |
|
|||||
Jessica Elizabeth RICHMOND | Trustee | 24 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Laura Jayne BOUCHARD | Trustee | 13 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Keady Kathryn SMITH | Trustee | 10 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
THOMAS HUTT | Trustee | 08 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
DAVID CHRISTOPHER HALFORD | Trustee | 12 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Beverley Campbell | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £390.18k | £184.63k | £134.43k | £261.09k | £363.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £330.84k | £165.88k | £207.25k | £286.13k | £333.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 28 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 28 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 15 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 15 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 19 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 19 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 27 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 27 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 25/09/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/08/2011 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 02/09/2011 as amended on 19 Jun 2020
Charitable objects
1. THE RELIEF OF THE SICK-POOR LIVING IN EAST AFRICA, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN THE REGIONS OF MARA, TANZANIA, THE AREA OF MARSABIT, KENYA AND REGIONS OF UGANDA, EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY THROUGH THE PROVISON OF GRANTS, GOODS OR SERVICES WITHIN A CHRISTIAN ETHOS 2. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SUBJECT OF POVERTY IN EAST AFRICA
Area of benefit
REGIONS OF THE DIOCESE OF MARA, TANZANIA AND THE AREA OF THIKA, KENYA. TANZANIA AND KENYA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Ashfield Road
SLEAFORD
Lincolnshire
NG34 7DZ
- Phone:
- 01491 651293
- Email:
- info@gomad.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window