THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST EBBE WITH HOLY TRINITY AND ST PETER LE BAILEY, OXFORD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The primary activity is the meeting for teaching of the bible, praise and prayer. The charity also provides for work with children of all ages on Sundays, after school, and in school holidays. It supports the mission of the church through prayer and financial support of partners. It also supports a number of trainees at theological college.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£1,953,170
Donations and legacies | £1.76m | |
Charitable activities | £41.79k | |
Other trading activities | £144.10k | |
Investments | £7.80k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£2,049,569
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £2.05m | |
Other | £0 |
-£6,769 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.05m |
People

38 Employee(s)
30 Trustee(s)
450 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 17 January 1973: Standard registration
- ST EBBE'S PCC, OXFORD (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
30 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Julia Evelyn Mure Cameron | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|||||
Angus Zane Fynes-Clinton | Trustee | 05 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Catherine Frances Randle | Trustee | 05 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Andrew John Butterworth | Trustee | 05 July 2024 |
|
|||||
David Calvin Sarjudeen | Trustee | 05 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
SUZANNE WILSON-HIGGINS | Trustee | 05 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Thomas Nicholas | Trustee | 05 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Sleeman White | Trustee | 05 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev VAUGHAN EDWARD ROBERTS | Trustee | 05 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Rev Glenn Nesbitt | Trustee | 05 July 2024 |
|
|||||
TREVOR RAYMENT | Trustee | 05 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Ruth Catherine Osborn | Trustee | 05 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Penelope Gay Vinden | Trustee | 05 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Catherine Knox Lyman | Trustee | 05 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rahul Prashanth Ravindran | Trustee | 05 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter Mark Ridgway | Trustee | 05 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Joshua David Skidmore | Trustee | 05 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
William Joel Waldock | Trustee | 05 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard James Brunt | Trustee | 05 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carmen Tseng | Trustee | 05 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gregory Brisk | Trustee | 05 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Peter David Lloyd Wilkinson | Trustee | 05 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sarah Bond | Trustee | 05 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jonathan Alistair Cook | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emily Sanders | Trustee | 26 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Claire Trollope | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Robert Philip Smith | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Timothy Dossor | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Benjamin Christopher George Vane | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Al Horn | Trustee | 01 April 2001 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.83m | £1.84m | £1.70m | £1.83m | £1.95m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.89m | £1.81m | £1.86m | £2.10m | £2.05m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £20.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.58m | £1.67m | £1.51m | £1.60m | £1.76m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £117.92k | £145.26k | £151.18k | £144.10k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £238.34k | £43.95k | £31.52k | £65.62k | £41.79k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £7.60k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £9.13k | £7.84k | £7.37k | £7.88k | £7.80k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £30.00k | £0 | £0 | £1.00k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.89m | £1.81m | £1.86m | £2.10m | £2.05m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £4.61k | £9.77k | £9.77k | £5.50k | £9.23k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £61.70k | £31.36k | £36.00k | £373.65k | £366.52k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £999.33k | £850.04k | £700.75k | £551.45k | £514.96k | |
|
Long-term investments | £232.96k | £247.99k | £290.16k | £256.65k | £219.97k | |
|
Other assets | £650.17k | £653.92k | £554.37k | £406.64k | £406.95k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£19.00k | -£17.00k | -£7.00k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £297.80k | £125.07k | £57.13k | £44.20k | £74.42k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 09 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 03 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 17 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 17 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE LOCAL
Linked charities
- 17 January 1973 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
1-2 Roger Bacon Lane
Oxford
OX1 1QE
- Phone:
- 01865240438
- Email:
- office@stebbes.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window