RAYLEIGH BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1128501
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

This Church exists to: - bring people into God's family by sharing the Good News of Jesus, working closely with the local community, through the Town Council - encourage their growth through small groups, for sharing, teaching and training in God's Word - equip them for ministry and mission, by seeking to meet their needs and - all for God's glory and pleasure.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Essex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 11 March 2009: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • RBC (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Ricky Rew Chair 01 July 2017
None on record
Kevin Andrew Brown Trustee 09 July 2024
None on record
Louise Susan Hodson Trustee 09 July 2024
None on record
IAN ROBERT DOUGLAS Trustee 09 July 2024
WESTCLIFF FREE CHURCH
Received: On time
Darren Stainer Trustee 01 November 2022
None on record
Belinda Dolan Trustee 30 November 2021
None on record
Carol Jones Trustee 25 June 2019
None on record
Lynn John Dobson Trustee 23 May 2017
ACTIVE CHRISTIAN TRUST (THE MEGACENTRE)
Received: On time
LINDA HARRISON Trustee 14 July 2015
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £365.19k £278.54k £247.90k £287.53k £553.88k
Total expenditure £345.64k £245.17k £245.02k £441.56k £964.38k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £548 £1.41k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £520.28k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £26.08k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £7.51k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £831.45k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £402
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £3.94k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £30.58k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £132.52k

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets N/A N/A N/A N/A £396.93k
Long-term investments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Other assets N/A N/A N/A N/A £574.80k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Total liabilities N/A N/A N/A N/A £538.56k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 12 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 12 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 14 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 14 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 20 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 20 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 15 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 15 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 25 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 25 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Rayleigh Baptist Church
High Street
RAYLEIGH
SS6 7QA
Phone:
01268745730