WESLEY METHODIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Wesley is Christian faith community offering regular Christian worship and community hospitality through its premises during the week, including arts and music events and exhibitions, cafe facilities (via its affiliated company, Wesley Coffee Bar), creche and toddler groups, community bread making sessions and lettings to a variety of local groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

25 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Flintshire
Governance
- 15 September 2010: Previously excepted registration
- THE WESLEY CHURCH CENTRE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
25 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev JOHN NEIL STACEY | Chair | 30 April 2012 |
|
|||||
Helen Kay Johnson | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael Haynes | Trustee | 14 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ian Evans | Trustee | 14 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
DENISE MARGARET KINGSNORTH BSc | Trustee | 02 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr MARK EDWARD GANT BA PhD | Trustee | 02 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Deacon Suzanne Marie Sale BSc | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|||||
John Terence Green | Trustee | 26 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Pauline Goodlad | Trustee | 26 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Shirley Stacey FCCA | Trustee | 21 January 2021 |
|
|||||
Christopher David Royton | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rosalind Angela Alexander-Macquiban B.Phil | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Heather Janet Walker | Trustee | 17 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Townsend | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|||||
Dr DAVID ACQUAYE | Trustee | 23 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
GILLIAN LANGRICK | Trustee | 25 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Pearson | Trustee | 10 December 2013 |
|
|||||
Professor David Clough | Trustee | 10 December 2013 |
|
|||||
Jane Denman Krause MA FRGS | Trustee | 25 May 2012 |
|
|||||
ANDREW JAMES RAMSEY BA ACMA | Trustee | 25 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN CHARLTON HEALD MA CENG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr HEATHER PEARSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr DEREK JOHN FRY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Malcolm Pearson | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LEYLAND JEREMY HAYNES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £265.00k | £251.49k | £179.01k | £280.84k | £269.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £254.13k | £213.02k | £165.77k | £376.14k | £240.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £5.99k | £26.69k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 04 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 04 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 12 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 12 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 28 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 28 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 13 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 13 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)
Charitable objects
The purposes of the Methodist Church are and shall be deemed to have been since the date of union the advancement of - (a) the Christian faith in accordance with the doctrinal standards and the dicipline of the Methodist Church; (b) any charitable purpose for the time being of any Connexional, district, circuit, local or other organisation of the Methodist Church; (c) any charitable purpose for the time being of any society or institution subsiduary or ancillary to the Methodist Church; (d) any purpose for the time being of any charity being a charity subsidiary or ancillary to the Methodist Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Wesley Methodist Church
St. John Street
CHESTER
CH1 1DA
- Phone:
- 01244323037
- Email:
- info@wesleychester.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window