Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST ANDREW, TOTTERIDGE

Charity Number: 1128816
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £157.64k £213.15k £220.38k £193.15k £126.42k
Total expenditure £185.58k £190.26k £135.09k £167.53k £165.40k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £5.25k £2.57k £2.75k £16.09k £2.38k