WESLEY METHODIST CHURCH, CAMBRIDGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our mission is to be a Worshipping, Welcoming, Witnessing, Christian Community with a distinctive Methodist character serving Cambridge and district.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

15 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 24 April 2009: Previously excepted registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Malcolm Haslett | Trustee | 25 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Philip Howie | Trustee | 27 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Angus Ferguson Campbell | Trustee | 27 April 2021 |
|
|||||
Adrian Mackintosh | Trustee | 01 February 2018 |
|
|||||
Katharine Anne Batty | Trustee | 01 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Lynda Meharry | Trustee | 01 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Deacon Ian Henry Murray | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|||||
Dorothy Haslett | Trustee | 01 August 2001 |
|
|
||||
JANET DAVIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ELAINE J PAPALOIZOU | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
John Christopher Baillie Papaloizou | Trustee |
|
||||||
GRAHAM BURGHALL | Trustee |
|
||||||
PAUL ASHLEY | Trustee |
|
||||||
GEOFFREY BATTY MA | Trustee |
|
||||||
BARBARA SINCLAIR | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £234.97k | £237.92k | £205.47k | £277.07k | £219.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £247.61k | £283.57k | £235.22k | £276.55k | £276.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £15.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 06 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 06 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 24 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 24 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 13 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 13 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 03 July 2020 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 03 July 2020 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)
Charitable objects
The purposes of the Methodist Church are and shall be deemed to have been since the date of union the advancement of - (a) the Christian faith in accordance with the doctrinal standards and the dicipline of the Methodist Church; (b) any charitable purpose for the time being of any Connexional, district, circuit, local or other organisation of the Methodist Church; (c) any charitable purpose for the time being of any society or institution subsiduary or ancillary to the Methodist Church; (d) any purpose for the time being of any charity being a charity subsidiary or ancillary to the Methodist Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
WESLEY METHODIST CHURCH
CHRISTS PIECES
CAMBRIDGE
CB1 1LG
- Phone:
- 01223352115
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window