Financial history MOORFIELDS LIONS KORLE BU TRUST

Charity number: 1130230
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £11.05k £13.90k £65.51k £25.20k £88.50k
Total expenditure £36.84k £28.12k £60.43k £84.62k £85.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A