Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST ALDATES, OXFORD
Charity Number: 1131154

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Stephen Foster | Chair | 11 April 2021 |
|
|||||||||
Lawrence Owusu | Trustee | 28 April 2025 |
|
|
||||||||
Andrew Legg | Trustee | 28 April 2025 |
|
|
||||||||
Shumirai Kupara | Trustee | 28 April 2025 |
|
|
||||||||
Reema Shinhmar | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
David Peter Bennet | Trustee | 23 April 2024 |
|
|||||||||
Ifeanyi Maijeh | Trustee | 28 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Carol Lister | Trustee | 23 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Serenus Chelliah | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Rachael Clear | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
James Mitchell | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Jeremy Basset | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|||||||||
Wongani Mwanza | Trustee | 23 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr Colleen McGregor | Trustee | 23 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Alissa Moore-Williams | Trustee | 23 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Nemi Wilton | Trustee | 23 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Mrs Funmi Durodola | Trustee | 26 April 2017 |
|
|
||||||||
ANDREW JAMES DAVISSON | Trustee | 21 April 2016 |
|
|||||||||
REV Mark Brickman | Trustee | 02 April 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.