Trustees WIGAN METHODIST MISSION
Charity number: 1128821

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Peter Powers | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Brian Rollins | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Yener Donmez | Trustee | 20 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Green | Trustee | 28 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Susan McLean | Trustee | 15 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Janet Mary Williams | Trustee | 30 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Williams | Trustee | 30 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Joshua Otchere | Trustee | 05 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
RUTH RUSSELL | Trustee | 17 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
MYRA ATHERTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS HAZEL ROLLINS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr JOHN PARKER PHD | Trustee |
|
||||||
MARGARET PARKER | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.