FACING AFRICA NOMA LTD
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity was previously registered under the reg.no. 1072505 but in March 2009 the Charity changed status to become a charity limited by guarantee. The Charity continues to work to send teams of volunteer surgeons, anaesthetists and nurses to Ethiopia to operate on Noma victims and other facial deformities. For fuller details please also refer to our website, www.facingafrica.org.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Services
- Ethiopia
Governance
- 16 April 2009: Standard registration
- 17 April 2019: Funds received from 1068293 THE NOVA CHARITABLE TRUST
- 26 November 2024: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £135.44k | £85.13k | £53.77k | £46.93k | £154.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £240.47k | £130.28k | £51.72k | £91.15k | £212.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £4.81k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 7 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 7 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 14 August 2024 | 106 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 14 August 2024 | 106 days late | |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 23 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 23 February 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 31 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 31 March 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 16 MARCH 2009
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PERSONS SUFFERING FROM NOMA IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FREE TREATMENT IN THE FORM OF FACIAL RECONSTRUCTION FREE ACCOMMODATION AND TRAVEL FOR PATIENTS AND THE PROVISION OF HEALTH SERVICES FOR TREATMENT OF VICTIMS LOCALLY.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NIGERIA AND ETHIOPIA.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window