Trustees BUXTON METHODIST CHURCH
Charity number: 1129654

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anne-Marie Bentley | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA LUCILLE CRAWFORD | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Nicholas Geoffrey Taylor | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD CHARLES SILSON | Trustee | 01 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN MARGARET ANFIELD | Trustee | 01 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
REV ANDREW PARKER | Trustee | 02 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
MRS KATE MACLEAN | Trustee | 02 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
GLYNIS ANITA LEYLAND | Trustee | 19 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
PETER DAVID JOHNSON | Trustee | 19 July 2011 |
|
|||||
Ronald Spence Sinclair | Trustee |
|
||||||
IAN MALCOLM GEOFFREY STUBBS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN ROBERT ANFIELD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS CHRISTINE HODKINSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
WENDY ELIZABETH JONES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANNA LOUISE QUICK | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.