Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HOLY TRINITY, PRESTWOOD

Charity number: 1129233
Charity reporting is up to date (131 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £168.71k £157.70k £152.81k £160.52k £167.50k
Total expenditure £145.95k £147.15k £162.36k £160.54k £164.87k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £3.00k N/A N/A