LEYLAND ROAD METHODIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of regular public acts of worship open to both members and non-members of the church. Pastoral work including visiting the sick and bereaved. Promoting the whole mission of the church through provision of activities for older people, parents and toddlers, and youth clubs and lunch clubs, all with a Christian ethos. Supporting other UK and overseas charities financially and with prayer.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

24 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Sefton
Governance
- 01 June 2009: Previously excepted registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
24 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Ernest Grimshaw | Chair | 01 September 2024 |
|
|||||||
Deborah Jane Attwater | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||||
David John Attwater | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Diane Elizabeth Beirne | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Anthony Ernest Young | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Elizabeth Wallbank | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Diane Parkinson | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Julie Sharon Plant | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Janice Young | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||
John Clifton Durkin | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Moira Chadwick | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Tom Chadwick | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Joan Vera Hayward | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Stephen Hardiman | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|||||||
DAVID WILLIAM POTTS | Trustee | 01 August 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Christopher George Hall | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|||||||
Rev Patrick Michael Evans | Trustee | 01 January 2014 |
|
|||||||
Andrew Malcolm Tate | Trustee | 01 September 2012 |
|
|||||||
MARGARET CROSBY | Trustee |
|
||||||||
OLWEN EMMA WALSH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
Mrs Jean McKenna | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
JOHN SCHOFIELD ATTWATER | Trustee |
|
||||||||
SHIRLEY ANNE POTTS | Trustee |
|
||||||||
PAUL JOHN GRAY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £124.52k | £109.30k | £162.50k | £114.31k | £127.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £129.88k | £98.35k | £158.00k | £118.81k | £130.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 04 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 04 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 12 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 12 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 29 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 29 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)
Charitable objects
The purposes of the Methodist Church are and shall be deemed to have been since the date of union the advancement of - (a) the Christian faith in accordance with the doctrinal standards and the discipline of the Methodist Church; (b) any charitable purpose for the time being of any Connexional, district, circuit, local or other organisation of the Methodist Church; (c) any charitable purpose for the time being of any society or institution subsiduary or ancillary to the Methodist Church; (d) any purpose for the time being of any charity being a charity subsidiary or ancillary to the Methodist Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Methodist Church - office
Leyland Road
SOUTHPORT
Merseyside
PR9 9JQ
- Phone:
- 01704536648
- Email:
- leyland.road@btopenworld.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window